judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DARRELL A. NELSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CO-0078
Short Caption:DARRELL A. NELSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Other Criminal
Lead: 11-CO-0077 Consolidated:11-CO-0078
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL12045-89Filed Date:01/21/2011

Opening Event Date:01/21/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/20/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDarrell A. Nelson YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/21/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/10/2011 ORDERED, SS, that appeals nos 10CO77 & 10CO78 are CONSOLIDATED FOR ALL PURPOSES herein. It is *****MORE*****
02/10/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL w/n 20 days from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why these appeals should not be dismissed for having been taken from a non-appealable order since denials of motions to dismiss indictments on grounds other than double jeopardy...are NON APPEALABLE. (BY: ETW)
02/10/2011TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
03/16/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - to court order (titled as: memo of law in support of motion to dismiss indictment for F.R.Cr. P.6 violations, and motion to inspect list of names of qualified grand jurors who voted the indictment)
03/29/2011 ORDERED, SS, that the APPEALS ARE HEREBY DISMISSED since by entering his plea, appellant waived the issues concerning his indictment...SEE HARDCOPY (GLPRFE) (rl)
03/29/2011DISMISSED
04/20/2011MANDATE ISSUED
07/12/2011FiledCopy/Notice Of Petition For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)
10/11/2011FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari on October 3, 2011 (Appellant)Denied
01/23/2012FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For rehearing from Supreme Court (Appellant)