judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LIMON VS. GREWAL C/W 33707

Case Information: 33525
Short Caption:LIMON VS. GREWAL C/W 33707Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:33525*, 33707 Related Case(s): 33707
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A350134Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/08/1999 / Galatz, NeilSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/13/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/29/1998OtherDisqualification of Justice Maupin. Sat in district court proceedings. NOTE: See 6/4/99 docket entry--Justice Maupin no longer disqualified.
12/29/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Robert A. Brown--check no. 1317.
12/29/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00535
12/29/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
01/08/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Neil Galatz. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/11/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: 1/7/99. 99-00154
01/15/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Notice of entry of order filed 11/24/98. Due Date: 10 days
01/15/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. 02/23/98; 10/09/98; and 10/20/98. Proceedings: To Court Reporter: Pasty Smith. 99-00296
02/04/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order. Filed in district court on: 11/24/98. 99-00779
03/05/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. Docketing statement due: 10 days from the date of this order or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against counsel for appellant. 99-01574
03/16/1999Other Other. Mailed copy of docketing statement to attorney Robert A. Brown for appellant. He never received a copy of the docketing statement.
04/14/1999Other Returned Unfiled Document. Returned, UNFILED, "Motion to Extend Time For Filing Docketing Statement" and "Docketing Statement Civil Appeals" to attorney Robert A. Brown. No Nevada Counsel signature on either document.
04/26/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 99-03244
04/29/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The clerk shall forthwith file the docketing statement, provisionally submitted with the motion on April 26, 1999. 99-03400
04/29/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-03245
05/28/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-04428
06/04/1999Notice/Outgoing Notice of Justice Disqualification. Upon further review it has been determined that Justice Maupin will not be disqualified from participation in this matter.
06/04/1999MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. (nos. 33525/33707). 99-04680
07/09/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Consolidation. We grant the unopposed motion to consolidate these appeals. We herby consolidate the above-entitled matters for all appellate purposes. The parties were unable to agree to a settlemnt of these consolidated appeals. Transcripts due: 30 days from reporter Patsy Smith and Rene Silvaggio. Briefing schedule: Opening brief and appendix: Appellants in docket no. 33525 (Limons) shall have 100 days. Answering brief: Respondents in Docket No. 33535 (Grewals) shall have 30 days thereafter. The answering brief shall contain an answer to the opening brief in No. 33525 as well as the issues the Grewals desire to raise in their consolidated appeal in No. 33707. Reply brief: Limons shall have 30 days thereafter. The reply brief shall contain their reply to the Grewals' answering brief and their answer to the issues Grewals raise in No. 33707. Reply Brief on cross-appeal: Grewals shall have 30 days thereafter. (Nos. 33525 & 33707) 99-06073
07/29/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit. (nos. 33525/33707). 99-06925
08/13/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. 02/23/98; 10/09/98; 10/20/98 (2); 11/02/98; 11/03/98; 11/04/98; and 11/05/98 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Patsy K. Smith (nos. 33525/33707 - placed in 33525). 99-07553
10/13/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion to Extend time for filing Appellants' and Respondents' Briefs and Respective Appendix. (Nos. 33525 and 33707). 99-09944
10/15/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We grant appellants' motion. Appellants in Docket No. 33525 shall have to and including December 8, 1999, to file the opening biref and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with our order entered on July 9, 1999. Court reporter Renee Silvaggio shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, file with this court certified copies of any transcripts requested by appellants which have not yet been filed in this matter. fn1[On August 13, 1999, court reporter Patsy K. Smith filed certified copies of transcripts of hearings conducted on February 23, 1998, October 9, 1998, October 20, 1998, November 2, 1998, November 3, 1998, November 4, 19998, and November 5, 1998]. Nos. 33525, 33707. 99-09998
10/25/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: October 21, 22, 23, 26 and 27. Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio. Nos. 33525 & 33707. 99-10400
12/09/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: October 28, 1998. Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio. Nos. 33525 & 33707. 99-12345
12/09/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion to extend time for filing Appellants' and Respondents' Briefs and Respective Appendix. 99-12365
12/21/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. Court reporter Renee Silvaggio shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, file any omitted transcripts requested by appellants. Appellants in Docket No. 33525 shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with the briefing schedule set forth in our order entered on July 9, 1999. Nos. 33525, 33707. 99-12992
01/04/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: California overnight, No Postmark. Nos. 33525, 33707. 00-00092
01/04/2000Other Other. Returned unfiled Appellant's Appendix. Nos. 33525 and 33707.
01/11/2000MotionFiled Motion. Grewel Motion for: 1. Extension of Time to File Answering and Opening Brief; 2. Enlargement of Page Limitation to Allow 30 Pages for Answering Brief and 30 Pages for Opening Brief. Nos. 33525 and 33707. 00-00474
01/14/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Compliance. Compliance to Opening Brief. Case No. 33525, 33707. 00-00679
01/19/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion to Extend Time for Filing Appellants' Appendix (nos. 33525/33707). 00-00858
01/19/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit. Affidavit of Robert A. Brown re: Appellants' Appendix (nos. 33525/33707). 00-00859
01/19/2000AppendixReceived Appendix. (nos. 33525/33707). 00-00862
03/08/2000Other Other. Received Respondent's Pamphlet Containing Legal Authorities in Support of Grewal Answering Brief and Grewel Opening Brief. Nos. 33525 & 33707. 00-03687
03/09/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We grant the Grewals' unopposed motion. The Grewals shall have to March 13, 2000, to file their combined answering and opening brief, not to exceed 60 pages. On January 19, 2000, appellants in docket No. 33525 filed a motion requesting an extension of time to file appellants' appendix. We grant appellants' unopposed motion. The clerk shall forthwith file appellants' appendix provisionally received on January 19, 2000. Nos. 33525, 33707. 00-03729
03/09/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Nos. 33525 and 33707-Appendix filed in No. 33525. 00-00862
03/09/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Nos. 33525 and 33707-Appendix filed in No. 33525. 00-03685
03/09/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Nos. 33525 and 33707-Appendix filed in No. 33525. 00-03686
03/09/2000Other Other. Filed Respondent's Pamphlet Containing Legal Authorities in Support of Grewal Answering Brief and Grewel Opening Brief. Nos. 33525 and 33707-Phamphlet filed in No. 33525. 00-03687
03/09/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Nos. 33525, 33707. 00-03688
04/11/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Answer Brief on Cross-Appeal. Mailed on: Hand delivered 4/11/00. Nos. 33525 & 33707. (Filed per JB) 00-05810
04/11/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 4/11/00. Nos. 33525 & 33707. (Filed per JB) 00-05811
05/16/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Grewal Reply Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 5/15/00. Nos. 33525 & 33707. 00-08182
09/11/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from firm of JB & Associates re: funds owed. Nos. 33525/33707 00-15967
12/07/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. In response to letter from firm of JB & Associates. Nos. 33525 & 33707.
03/13/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. Nos. 33525/33707. (01-04506) 01-04506
03/13/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. SNP01A-CY/ML/NB. Nos. 33525/33707
04/06/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. These are consolidated appeals from a judgment on a jury verdict and from an order denying attorney fees in a personal injury action. "ORDER the judgment and the order of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP01A-CY/ML/NB Nos. 33525/33707. 01-05897
05/02/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-06067
05/02/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/01/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 9, 2001. 01-06067