judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 94-0547
94-0547
06/08/1994
App Writ of Error
JOHN BAKER D/B/A BAKER ROOFING AND SHEETMETAL
KURT KUNZMAN & WIFE JUDY KUNZMAN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/24/1994Reply to ResponseRespondent
06/08/1994Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
08/31/1994Record returned to Court of AppealsNo Mo/Re filed
07/28/1994Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied
06/24/1994Reply to Response
06/23/1994Case forwarded to Court
06/08/1994Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
08/31/1994Case StoredCase stored.No Mo/Re filed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
KUNZMAN, JUDYRespondentMr. T. J. Baynham Jr.
KUNZMAN, KURTRespondentMr. T. J. Baynham Jr.
BAKER, JOHNPetitionerMr. Kenneth A. Huchton
BAKER ROOFING AND SHEETMETALPetitionerMr. Kenneth A. Huchton
Court of Appeals Information:
12-93-00071-CV
Aff As Ref
873 SW2d 753, 03-30-94
12th Court of Appeals
Honorable CHARLES HOLCOMB
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 2
Smith
Honorable Randall Lee Rogers
35,060-A