judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 94-0548
94-0548
06/08/1994
App Writ of Error
JAN HEARD MALONE
JEANNIE MOSS (McCORD)
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
07/06/1994Brief receivedRespondent12 copies of C.O.A. Appellant Reply Brief
07/06/1994Reply to ResponseRespondent12 copies of C.O.A. Brief
06/08/1994Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
08/31/1994Record returned to Court of AppealsNo Mo/Re filed
07/28/1994Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied
07/06/1994Brief received12 copies of C.O.A. Appellant Reply Brief
07/06/1994Reply to Response12 copies of C.O.A. Brief
06/23/1994Case forwarded to Court
06/08/1994Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
08/31/1994Case StoredCase stored.No Mo/Re filed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
MOSS, JEANNIE (MCCORD)RespondentMr. Fred C. Head
MALONE, JAN HEARDPetitionerMr. Douglas R. McSwane Jr.
Mr. Michael E. Starr
Mr. Richard L. Ray
Court of Appeals Information:
12-92-00283-CV
Reversed & Remanded
880 SW2d 45, 02-25-94
12th Court of Appeals
Honorable CHARLES HOLCOMB
Trial Court Information
294th District Court
Van Zandt
Honorable Tommy W. Wallace
90-156