judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

INDUSTRIAL INSURANCE REGULATION VS. EICON

Case Information: 33530
Short Caption:INDUSTRIAL INSURANCE REGULATION VS. EICONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A385590Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/12/1999 / Dentico, MichaelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:06/13/2000 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:06/13/2000How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/29/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/29/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00544
01/07/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00093
01/12/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Michael V. Dentico. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
03/29/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-02283
04/12/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file a transcript request form or certificate of no transcript request and 120 days to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed with NRAP 31(a)(1). 99-02744
04/28/1999Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 99-03356
09/02/1999MotionFiled Stipulation. 99-08243
09/22/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We elect to treat the stipulation filed September 2, 1999, as an unopposed motion for an extension of time. Appellant shall, within 30 days of the date of this order, file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). We do not expect further requests for extensions of time absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 99-09003
10/22/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 10/22/99. 99-10335
10/22/1999AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vol. 1 and 2. 99-10336
10/22/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. 99-10383
10/29/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Letter from appellant enclosing two pages which were inadvertently left out of the Joint Appendix.. (Inserted pages 156 and 206 into appendix--lc). 99-10606
11/29/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 11/23/99. 99-11902
11/29/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 99-11903
12/02/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Supplemental Appendix to their Answer Brief. 99-12065
12/27/1999BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 12/27/99. 99-13171
01/21/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Withdraw Request for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. 00-01028
03/03/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On October 22, 1999, the Nevada Attorney for Injured Workers (NAIW) filed a motion for leave to file an amicus curiae brief in support of appeallant. We grant NAIW's unopposed motion. NAIW may, within 30 days from the date of this order, file and serve the amicus curiae brief. Respondent may, within 30 days from the filing of NAIW's brief, file an answering brief to NAIW's amicus curiae brief. fn1[On January 21, 2000, NAIW filed a motion to withdraw its request for leave to file an amicus curiae brief. We deny the motion to withdraw. Should NAIW fail to file its brief within the time period set forth above, this matter shall be resolved without the benefit of an amicus curiae brief.] 00-03357
04/04/2000MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 31 pages. (Amicus Brief). 00-05435
04/04/2000BriefFiled Amicus Brief. 00-05436
04/21/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for June 13, 2000 at the hour of 11:30 a.m. for 1/2 hour in Carson City.(NNP99B-CY/DA/ML) 00-06495
05/12/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, respondent has not filed an answering brief to NAIW's amicus curiae brief. Respondent's failure to file an answering brief is treated as an election not to file an answering brief. Briefing is deemed completed in this appeal. 00-07912
05/26/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 00-08876
06/13/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML
07/07/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Reversal. " . . . we reverse the district court's order granting EICN's petition for judicial review and reinstate the Administrator's decision to impose a $1,000.00 administrative fine on EICN and reinstate the Administrator's decision to impose a $500.00 benefit penalty on EICN, which is to be paid directly to the claimant pursuant to NRS 616D.120(3). NNNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-11588
07/27/2000MotionFiled Motion. 00-13058
08/01/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-13294
08/01/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/23/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 9, 2000. 00-13294
09/08/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On July 27, 2000, appellant moved this court to publish the order of reversal entered in this matter on July 7, 2000. No good cause appearing, we deny the motion. 00-15847