judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHARLES EDWARD JONES v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0073)
Case Number:S-11-0073Case Docketed On:03/30/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:CHARLES EDWARD JONES v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CHARLES EDWARD JONES, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCharles Edward JonesJanae Elizabeth Ruppert
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Sean Charles Chambers
John Guyton Knepper

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Jury Instructions, Criminal Law -Prosecutorial Misconduct, Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence
Opinion Number:2012 WY 82
Citation:278 P.3d 729

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/30/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/30/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/30/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/16/2011Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/16/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/17/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/31/2011Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance by Robert D. Pascoe on behalf of AppellantNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
06/02/2011Motion - Withdrawal of counsel - Tina Olson.MotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
06/03/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to WithdrawEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/03/2011Order - Granting withdrawal of counselOrderGranting withdrawal of counselFinal
06/06/2011Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/10/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/10/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/20/2011Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearanceNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
06/21/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Entry of appearance by Janae E. Ruppert for appellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/21/2011Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
06/24/2011Correspondence - Incoming. Received letter from appellant regarding his representation.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
06/27/2011Correspondence - Outgoing - sent response to appellant regarding representation.CorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
06/27/2011Order - Allowing Withdrawal of CounselOrderOtherFinal
08/15/2011Brief - Appellant. Brief was rejected for redaction, resubmitted into system at 5:00 p.m. Accepted as timely.BriefAppellantFinal
08/17/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant (Public Defender is listed on cover of brief, but an Order allowing the Public Defender to withdraw was filed on 6/3/2011).EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/24/2011Notice-Incoming - Designation of record (Appellant's)Notice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
09/30/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
10/03/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/19/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/02/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, five volumes. Volumes I, Original Papers; Volume II, Jury Instructions & Verdict; Volumes III-V, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/02/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
11/14/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
12/01/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - John Knepper for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/05/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Janae E. Ruppert for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/13/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Janae Elizabeth Ruppert for appellant; John Knepper, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
12/13/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/14/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/02/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/02/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/02/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/02/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/06/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 7/5/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal