judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-97-00043-CR
14-97-00043-CR
01/16/1997
Felony DWI
Escobar, Martir Vasquez
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/14/1999Case stored
03/24/1999Mandate due to be issued
03/24/1999Mandate Issued
03/24/1999Mandate Issued
03/01/1999No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
03/01/1999Petition for discretionary review due
02/12/1999Motion for rehearing DUE
02/12/1999No motion for rehearing FILED
01/28/1999Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
01/28/1999Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
01/27/1999Case ready to be set
01/27/1999Submitted
01/27/1999Submission
01/27/1999Submitted
01/27/1999Case ready to be set
01/13/1999Supplemental clerk's record FILED-ANT,APE,STA
10/29/1998Order Entered
08/13/1998Past due brief
08/09/1998Appellant's brief DUE
07/13/1998Reporter's Record Due
07/09/1998Order Entered
06/12/1998No Reporter's Record in Criminal case FILED
05/26/1998Reporter's Record Due
05/11/1998No payment arrangement made with court reporter
04/23/1998Order Entered
04/08/1998Past Due Notices sent to staff attorney for ORDER
01/07/1998Reporter's Record Due
12/08/1997No Reporter's Record in Criminal case FILED
03/11/1997No description available.
03/10/1997Record due
03/10/1997Transcript FILED
01/16/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
01/09/1997Date of Sentence
01/09/1997Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/03/2023Case StoredCase archived
03/24/1999Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasCalvin A. Hartmann
Escobar, Martir VasquezCriminal - AppellantMartir Vasquez Escobar
Trial Court Information
Co Crim Ct at Law No 14
Harris
Honorable Natalie Celeste Fleming
96-32119
90 Days TDCJ, $2000 Fine