judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-97-00011-CV
09-97-00011-CV
01/16/1997
Mandamus
Williams, Lloyd G.
Alworth, Honorable Lee G.
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/28/1997Miscellaneous MotionsMotion or Writ Denied
08/15/1997order received from another court
08/07/1997Letter
07/31/1997Writ DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
07/18/1997Miscellaneous Motions
07/16/1997Miscellaneous Motions
05/09/1997Motion to File Writ Filed
04/10/1997Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
04/07/1997Motion for Rehearing Filed
03/20/1997MANDATE ISSUED FROM HIGHER COURT AND CASE STORED
03/20/1997Opinion issuedMotion or Writ Granted
02/21/1997Mot.-Ext. File Sup Brief DispMotion or Writ Granted
02/21/1997Supplemental Brief Filed
02/11/1997Mot. for Ext. File Sup. Brief
02/06/1997Submitted
02/06/1997Submission
02/04/1997Response
02/03/1997Response
01/30/1997Submission
01/30/1997Writ Filed
01/30/1997Order Entered
01/23/1997Letter
01/23/1997Response
01/16/1997Writ Received
01/16/1997Motion to File Writ Filed
01/16/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/20/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Woodlands Financial ServicesAppelleeDavid G. Matthiesen
Alworth, Lee G.AppelleeHonorable Lee G. Alworth
Williams, Lloyd G.AppellantVan E. McFarland
Trial Court Information
Honorable John Paul Davis
97-07-0605 CV