judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-97-00048-CV
04-97-00048-CV
01/16/1997
Miscellaneous civil
Steven L. Holland
Gary L. Johnson; Et Al.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/21/1998Continuation of Information from previous event
10/21/1998Continuation of Information from previous event
10/21/1998Continuation of Information from previous event
10/21/1998Continuation of Information from previous event
10/21/1998Continuation of Information from previous event
10/21/1998Continuation of Information from previous event
10/21/1998Information regarding cause received
09/03/1998Mandate Issued
09/03/1998Mandate Issued
12/15/1997Mandate Issued
10/08/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/08/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/11/1997Letter of Inquiry Filed
07/08/1997Submitted
07/08/1997Submission
07/08/1997Submitted
06/06/1997Case ready to be set
06/06/1997Submission
06/06/1997Case ready to be set
06/03/1997Staff Attorney has been assigned to the case
03/24/1997Brief Filed
03/24/1997Waives Oral Argument
02/26/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
02/26/1997Order Entered
02/26/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
02/14/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
02/14/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
02/14/1997No Description Available.
02/10/1997No Description Available.
02/10/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
02/10/1997Information regarding cause received
01/30/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
01/30/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
01/30/1997Order Entered
01/16/1997No Description Available.
01/16/1997No Description Available.
01/16/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
11/26/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
11/26/1996Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/01/2004RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
09/03/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserAppelleeAnton E. Hackebeil
Bryan HartnettAppelleeBryan Hartnett
Pro Se: Steven L. HollandAppellantSteven L. Holland
Gary L. JohnsonAppelleeGary L. Johnson
J. PrestageAppelleeJ. Prestage
Pamela SpencerAppelleePamela Spencer
Trial Court Information
38th Judicial District Court
Real
Honorable Mickey R. Pennington
96-09-13880-CV
n/a