judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 11-97-00010-CV
11-97-00010-CV
01/16/1997
Miscellaneous civil
Vineyard, Cecil Don
Brown, Michael J. et al
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/23/2004Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
07/30/1998Miscellaneous motion disposedOverruled
07/13/1998Miscellaneous motion filed
03/17/1998Case returned from higher court
12/31/1997Yearly opinion book
12/31/1997Yearly opinion book
12/04/1997Application for writ of errorMotion or Writ Denied
10/23/1997Miscellaneous motion disposedDismissed
10/02/1997Miscellaneous motion disposedMotion dismissed as moot
10/01/1997Miscellaneous motion filed
09/22/1997Miscellaneous motion filed
09/19/1997Case forwarded to higher court
09/18/1997Petition for Discretionary Review in Criminal case or Petition for Review in Civil Case
09/18/1997Miscellaneous motion disposedMotion dismissed as moot
09/11/1997We send letter to lawyers, etc.
09/09/1997Mot. on extension of time disposed in CCAMotion or Writ Granted
08/28/1997Miscellaneous filing
08/28/1997Miscellaneous motion filed
08/25/1997TR received
08/22/1997Miscellaneous filing
08/21/1997Mot. - For rehearing disposedOverruled
08/21/1997Mot. - For rehearing disposedOverruled
08/21/1997Mot. - For rehearing disposedOverruled
08/21/1997Miscellaneous motion disposedOverruled
08/21/1997Miscellaneous motion disposedOverruled
08/21/1997Mot. - Ext. time to file MRH disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/18/1997Mot. - For rehearing filed
08/18/1997Miscellaneous filing
08/18/1997Motion for rehearing received - not filed
08/15/1997Mot. - For rehearing filed
08/15/1997Motion for rehearing received - not filed
08/13/1997Mot. - For rehearing filed
08/13/1997Motion for rehearing received - not filed
08/05/1997Miscellaneous motion filed
08/05/1997Mot. - Ext. time to file MRH
07/30/1997Miscellaneous motion filed
07/24/1997Miscellaneous motion disposedMotion dismissed as moot
07/24/1997Mot. - Ext. to file brief disposedMotion dismissed as moot
07/24/1997Miscellaneous motion disposedMotion dismissed as moot
07/24/1997Miscellaneous motion disposedMotion dismissed as moot
07/24/1997Mot. - Ext. to file brief disposedMotion dismissed as moot
07/24/1997Mot. - Ext. to file brief disposedMotion dismissed as moot
07/24/1997Miscellaneous motion disposedMotion dismissed as moot
07/24/1997Mot. - Ext. on notice of appeal disposedMotion dismissed as moot
07/24/1997Mot. - for continuance of submission disposedMotion dismissed as moot
07/24/1997Motion to dismiss disposedOverruled
07/24/1997Motion to dismiss disposedOverruled
07/24/1997Motion to dismiss disposedOverruled
07/24/1997Motion to dismiss disposedOverruled
07/24/1997Opinion issuedDismissed
07/17/1997Response to motion, brief, etc. filed
07/14/1997Mot. - Ext. to file brief
07/11/1997Response to motion, brief, etc. filed
06/30/1997Miscellaneous motion filed
06/27/1997Miscellaneous motion filed
06/27/1997Response to motion, brief, etc. filed
06/27/1997TR received
06/20/1997Mot. - Ext. to file brief
06/19/1997Case reinstated
06/19/1997Supp. TR received
06/19/1997Case reinstated
06/16/1997Mot. - Ext. to file brief
06/16/1997Response to motion, brief, etc. filed
06/10/1997Miscellaneous motion filed
06/09/1997Mot. - To dismiss appeal filed
06/02/1997Brief filed
06/02/1997Mot. - To dismiss appeal filed
05/29/1997Response to motion, brief, etc. filed
05/23/1997Mot. - For continuance of submission & argument
05/12/1997Mot. - To dismiss appeal filed
05/12/1997Mot. - To dismiss appeal filed
05/02/1997Miscellaneous motion filed
04/22/1997Miscellaneous motion filed
04/11/1997Mandate issued
03/13/1997Item returned to clerk's office, lawyer, etc.
03/13/1997Miscellaneous motion disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/18/1997Miscellaneous motion filed
02/06/1997Mot. - for continuance of submission disposedOverruled
02/06/1997Opinion issuedDismissed
01/31/1997Mot. - For continuance of submission & argument
01/16/1997TR filed
01/16/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/11/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Michael J. BrownAppelleeMichael J. Brown
Kerry FritzAppelleeJon Mark Hogg
Robert A. Junell
VIneyard, Cecil DonAppellantCecil Don Vineyard
Ernie ArmstrongAppelleeJoe E. Lea
Gene DulaneyAppelleeStewart Whitehead
Samantha CunninghamAppelleeMichael J. Brown
Stanley PavlasAppelleeLealand W. (Pete) Greene
Trial Court Information
132nd District Court
Scurry
Honorable Curt F. Steib, Judge
19,323