judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-97-00024-CV
08-97-00024-CV
01/16/1997
Miscellaneous civil
Macmorran, Elizabeth Jane
Wood, Frank B., Terry Cavalerri Wood, and William C. Macmorran
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/04/1998Mandate Issued
12/04/1998Mandate Issued
05/29/1998Decision from Supreme Court or CCAMotion or Writ Denied
01/30/1998Petition for Discretionary Review
12/11/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/11/1997Payment of fee due requested
12/11/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/03/1997Submitted
12/03/1997Submission
12/03/1997Submitted
12/02/1997Filed waiver of oral argument
12/02/1997Filed waiver of oral argument
12/02/1997Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
11/26/1997Fee paid
11/26/1997Miscellaneous Motion Filed
10/27/1997No description available.
10/23/1997Submission
10/02/1997Miscellaneous filing
09/30/1997Miscellaneous filing
08/29/1997Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/29/1997Opinion issuedAbated
08/15/1997Submission
07/29/1997Miscellaneous Motion Filed
04/30/1997Brief Filed
04/30/1997Case ready to be set
04/30/1997Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/30/1997Case ready to be set
04/17/1997Amended Motion Filed to Correct Original Motion
04/14/1997Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
03/21/1997Brief Filed
03/19/1997Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/07/1997Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
02/10/1997Supplemental Transcript Filed
02/06/1997Fee paid
02/06/1997Statement of Facts Filed
02/04/1997Payment of fee due requested
02/04/1997Transcript Filed
01/16/1997Notice of Appeal Filed
01/16/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/04/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
WOOD, FRANK B., TERRY CAVALERRAppelleeHon. L. Randall Lee
MACMORRAN, ELIZABETH JANEAppellantJeffrey S. Alley
Trial Court Information
327th District Court
El Paso
96-4699