judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 03-97-00023-CV
03-97-00023-CV
01/16/1997
Juvenile
In the Matter of E. P.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/09/2005Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
12/06/1999Case stored
07/07/1998Mandate Issued
04/09/1998Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
03/27/1998Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/23/1998Motion for rehearing filed
03/23/1998Extension on rehearing filed.
02/20/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/01/1997Submitted
12/01/1997Submission
11/06/1997Submission
10/10/1997Brief filed
10/10/1997Case ready to be set
09/18/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/05/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/14/1997Brief filed
07/15/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/01/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/02/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/15/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/28/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/08/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/28/1997Statement of Facts Filed
02/25/1997Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
02/07/1997Supplemental Transcript filed
01/29/1997Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
01/16/1997Transcript & SF Filed
01/16/1997Transcript Received
01/16/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
01/03/1997Statement of Facts Received
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/07/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
E., P.AppellantMr. Kameron D. Johnson
State Of TexasAppelleeThe Honorable Ronald Earle
Mr. R. Marc Ranc
Mr. C. Bryan Case Jr.
Trial Court Information
98th District Court
Travis
Honorable John K. Dietz
J-12,923