judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 6th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 06-97-00005-CR
06-97-00005-CR
01/16/1997
Capital Murder
Benjamin, Tamike Whaley
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/01/1998Mandate Issued
02/03/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/02/1998Submitted
02/02/1998Submission
12/11/1997Case ready to be set
12/11/1997Brief Filed
12/09/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/04/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/12/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/03/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/19/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/19/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/25/1997No Description Available.
07/29/1997Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/29/1997Order issued
07/23/1997Motion to Abate Appeal
06/23/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/16/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/23/1997Brief Filed
05/05/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/01/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/30/1997Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/30/1997Order issued
04/30/1997MOTION FILED
04/15/1997Mot ext time Sup SFACTS DispMotion or Writ Granted
04/11/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/10/1997Mot Ext time file Sup SFACTS
04/07/1997No Description Available.
04/07/1997Holding for Record
04/04/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/03/1997Holding for Record
04/03/1997No Description Available.
03/25/1997Mot ext time file STRANS DispMotion or Writ Granted
03/25/1997Motion DisposedOverruled
03/21/1997Mot ext time file STRANS
03/17/1997Exhibits Filed
03/17/1997Statement of Facts Filed
03/04/1997Mot ext time file STRANS DispOverruled
02/27/1997Mot ext time file STRANS
02/18/1997Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
02/13/1997Transcript Filed
02/10/1997Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
01/16/1997Notice of Appeal Filed
01/16/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/01/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
71st District Court
Harrison
Honorable Bonnie Leggat
96-0094
Life