judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-97-00009-CV
02-97-00009-CV
01/16/1997
Mandamus
Holt, Chuck and C.O. Holt, Inc., d/b/a Holt Roofing
Curry, Hon. Ken, Judge 153rd District Court, Tarrant County, Texas
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/20/2009Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
03/10/1997Case stored
01/24/1997Opinion issuedOverruled
01/23/1997Submitted
01/23/1997Submission
01/16/1997Motion to File
01/16/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/20/2009Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Holt, Chuck And C.o. Holt, IncAppellantCreighton Maynard
Holt RoofingAppellantCreighton Maynard
Curry, Judge, Hon. Ken 153Rd DAppelleeHon. Ken Curry
Tuggle, RickReal party in interestB. C. Cornish
Trial Court Information
153rd District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Ken Curry
153-162765-96