judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 03-97-00026-CV
03-97-00026-CV
01/16/1997
Unknown Civil Case Type.
Expunction Case
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/27/2004Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
11/17/1998CASE STORED
05/01/1997Mandate Issued
01/30/1997Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/30/1997Opinion issuedDismissed
01/16/1997Motion for Dismissal Filed
01/16/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/01/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
State Of TexasAppellantMs. Barbara Misle
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 3
Travis
Honorable Orlinda Naranjo
230,213