judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-97-00046-CR
04-97-00046-CR
01/16/1997
Sexual Abuse or Rape of Child
John D. Siverand
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/16/1998Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
06/08/1998Mandate Issued
06/08/1998Mandate Issued
03/18/1998Motion to Withdraw Counsel DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/18/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/18/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/08/1998No New Event but Update in Calendar
12/09/1997Submitted
12/09/1997Submission
12/09/1997Submitted
10/29/1997Submission
09/22/1997Brief Filed
09/22/1997Waives Oral Argument
09/22/1997Case ready to be set
09/22/1997Case ready to be set
09/10/1997Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/08/1997Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
08/14/1997Motion to Withdraw Counsel FiledAbeyance
08/14/1997Brief Filed
08/14/1997Requests Oral Argument
07/28/1997Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion Granted in Part
07/21/1997Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
06/26/1997No Description Available.Filing is Moot
06/20/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
06/20/1997No Description Available.
06/19/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
06/19/1997No Description Available.
06/19/1997Exhibits Filed
04/24/1997No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
04/21/1997No Description Available.
03/10/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
03/10/1997No Description Available.Motion Granted in Part
02/28/1997Affidavit of Court Reporter Filed
02/25/1997No Description Available.
02/25/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
02/25/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
02/25/1997No Description Available.
02/24/1997Staff Attorney has been assigned to the case
02/24/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
02/24/1997Court Reporter's Affidavit Due
02/20/1997No Description Available.
02/14/1997No Description Available.
02/14/1997No Description Available.
01/16/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
01/14/1997Notice of Appeal Filed
12/19/1996Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/08/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasMary Catherine Hayes
Edward F. Shaughnessy, III
John D. SiverandCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
187th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Phil Chavarria, Jr.
95-CR-4605
Life (Counts I & II).