judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 94-0539
94-0539
06/07/1994
App Writ of Error
WILLIAM J. TINNING
THE STATE BAR OF TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/09/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/08/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
08/26/1994Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)on behalf of Timothy Patton by Timothy Patton, 8626 Tesoro, Suite 510, San Antonio, TX 210/822-8596
08/17/1994Motion for RehearingPetitionerRecord in Clerk's office; Rule 4(b) envelope attached to original; Mo/Re of order denying App and subject thereto, motion for stay of Mandate
06/21/1994Reply to ResponseRespondent
06/07/1994Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/09/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/08/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
12/02/1994Record returned to Court of AppealsMo/Re Overruled
12/01/1994Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruled
08/26/1994Amicus Curiae Brief receivedon behalf of Timothy Patton by Timothy Patton, 8626 Tesoro, Suite 510, San Antonio, TX 210/822-8596
08/17/1994Conditional motion for rehearingNo description available.CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date.
08/17/1994Motion for RehearingRecord in Clerk's office; Rule 4(b) envelope attached to original; Mo/Re of order denying App and subject thereto, motion for stay of Mandate
08/17/1994Motion for Rehearing forwardedRecord remains in Clerk's office; Rule 4(b) envelope attached to original
08/12/1994Notice requesting filing fee$10 for Mo/Re to Mr. Cook
07/28/1994Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied
06/23/1994Case forwarded to Court
06/21/1994Reply to Response
06/07/1994Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
12/02/1994Case StoredCase stored.Mo/Re Overruled
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
TINNING, WILLIAM J.PetitionerMr. Scott T. Cook
Mr. William A. Dudley
STATE BAR OF TEXASRespondentMs. Linda Acevedo
Court of Appeals Information:
13-92-00270-CV
Reversed & Remanded
875 SW2d 403, 03-24-94
13th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
28th District Court
Nueces
Honorable Eric Brown
90-3863-A