judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-94-00188-CR
10-94-00188-CR
06/07/1994
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Steven Morrison
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/15/1995Case stored
05/15/1995Mandate issued by this Court
03/29/1995Opinion issuedDismissed
01/27/1995Submitted
01/27/1995Submission
01/03/1995Submission
11/23/1994Case ready to be set
11/23/1994No Description Available.
11/16/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/09/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed
10/14/1994No Description Available.
08/24/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/19/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed
07/20/1994No Description Available.
07/06/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
06/29/1994No Description Available.
06/14/1994No Description Available.
06/07/1994Electronic Tapes filed/Statement of Facts
06/07/1994Notice of Appeal filed
06/07/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/15/2095Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Morrison, StevenAppellantAnnette K. Hanna
Hon. Dana L. Zachary
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasBill R. Turner
Hon. James W. Locke
Trial Court Information
272nd District Court
Brazos
Honorable John M. Delaney
18,913-272
35 yrs.