Case: A-4617
A-4617
04/07/1954
Application for Writ of Error
BILL FLATTE
KOSSMAN BUICK COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/18/1954 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
04/17/1954 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
04/07/1954 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/20/1954 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
05/18/1954 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
04/17/1954 | Response to Petition | | ||
04/12/1954 | Motion to dismiss | Overruled | | |
04/07/1954 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
04/07/1954 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Kossman Buick Company | Respondent | |
Bill Flatte | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information