judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HENDERSON VS. CAL/PAC PAINTING

Case Information: 33527
Short Caption:HENDERSON VS. CAL/PAC PAINTINGCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A363007Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/12/1999 / Dentico, MichaelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/02/2000How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/29/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Greenman firm-check no. 36437.
12/29/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00540
01/04/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. Sat in district court proceeding.
01/12/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Michael V. Dentico. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/13/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00223
01/21/1999Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. Respondent Cal/Pac Painting & Coatings, Inc.'s Response to Appellant's Docketing Statement. 99-00412
03/04/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: April 26, 1999 at 2:00 p.m. 210 E Charleston Blvd., Las Vegas, NV. Mailed on: 3/2/99. 99-01535
04/30/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-03467
05/14/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file a transcript request form or certificate of no transcript request and shall have 120 days to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 99-03971
05/27/1999Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 99-04391
06/10/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. 99-04932
09/13/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: October 11, 1999. 99-08588
10/13/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 99-09908
10/13/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 10/11/99. 99-09918
11/16/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 11/15/99. 99-11352
11/16/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 99-11354
11/18/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Service (Appendix). 99-11485
11/22/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Joinder. Employer's Insurance Company of Nevada's Joinder in Cal/Pac's answering brief. NRAP 28(i). 99-11687
12/20/1999BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 12/15/99. 99-12946
03/02/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein. 00-03346
03/02/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Submitted on the record and briefs this day.
08/10/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-13937
09/05/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-13962
09/05/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 2, 2000. 00-13962