judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOAN COZORT LAWRENCE v. CITY OF RAWLINS and TRANSPORTATION COMMISSION OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0134)
Case Number:S-09-0134Case Docketed On:07/07/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:JOAN COZORT LAWRENCE v. CITY OF RAWLINS and TRANSPORTATION COMMISSION OF WYOMING
Full Title:JOAN COZORT LAWRENCE, a/k/a JOAN LAWRENCE, a/k/a JOAN COZORT, Appellant (Defendant), v. CITY OF RAWLINS, a municipal corporation, Appellee (Plaintiff), and TRANSPORTATION COMMISSION OF WYOMING, Appellee (Third-Party Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJoan LawrenceBruce T. Moats
AppelleeCity of RawlinsDaniel T. Massey
Amy Lora Ann Bach
AppelleeTransportation Commission of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Douglas J. Moench

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Planning and Zoning, Property
Opinion Number:2010 WY 7
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/07/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/07/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/07/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/07/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/18/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/18/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant Joan LawrenceEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/08/2009Notice-Incoming - Designation of record by counsel for AppellantNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
09/11/2009Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
09/11/2009Memorandum - In support of motionMemorandumIn support of motionFinal
09/14/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion of Appellee to Dismiss - Involuntary; Appellee's Memorandum in Support of Motion and Proposed OrderEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/16/2009Response/Objection - Motion - Opposition to appellee's motion to dismiss; and brief in support of oppositionResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
09/16/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Opposition to appellee's motion to dismiss; brief in support of opposition to appellee's motion to dismiss; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/29/2009Order - Denying Motion to Dismiss AppealOrderDenyFinal
10/05/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
10/05/2009Brief - Failure to file - appellee Transportation CommissionBriefFailure to file - appelleeFinal
10/06/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee City of RawlinsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/13/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
10/13/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellant Joan LawrenceEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/14/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/20/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
10/20/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/20/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/26/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/02/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Bruce Moats for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/12/2009Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Justice GoldenNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
11/12/2009Order - Assignment of judge - Peter G. Arnold, District Judge, assigned to act in this matter.OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
11/16/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Daniel Massey for appellee City of Rawlins.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/17/2009Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance by Amy L. Bach on behalf of Appellee City of RawlinsNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
11/19/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Bruce T. Moats for appellant; Daniel T. Massey for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/19/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
01/25/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/10/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/10/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/10/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/10/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/12/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 2/11/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal