judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-94-00310-CV
04-94-00310-CV
06/07/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Jones, Donald J.
Jones, Gail M.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/17/1995Mandate Issued
11/17/1995Mandate Issued
11/16/1995Case Returned from Higher Court
09/14/1995Higher Court DecisionMotion or Writ Denied
06/27/1995Information regarding cause received
06/26/1995Case Forwarded to Higher Court
06/12/1995Writ of Error filed
05/15/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/05/1995Motion for Rehearing Filed
03/22/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/22/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/11/1995Submitted
01/11/1995Submission
01/11/1995Submitted
12/09/1994Submission
09/16/1994Reply brief filed
08/22/1994Brief Filed
08/22/1994Case ready to be set
08/22/1994Requests Oral Argument
08/22/1994Case ready to be set
08/09/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/09/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/05/1994Verification Filed
08/04/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
07/14/1994Brief Filed
07/14/1994Requests Oral Argument
06/21/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/21/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/17/1994Alternative Dispute Resolution Procedure Sent
06/07/1994No Description Available.
06/07/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/03/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
05/12/1994No Description Available.
05/12/1994No Description Available.
05/06/1994Appeal Bond Filed
05/06/1994Appeal Bond Filed
03/08/1994Motion for New Trial Filed
02/07/1994Judgment Signed in Trial Court
02/07/1994Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/17/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Gail M. JonesAppelleeRichard J. Karam
Bill Jolly
Donald J. JonesAppellantJeffrey L. Pfeifer
Trial Court Information
224th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Robert L. Eschenburg, II
87-CI-21770
N/A