judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 94-0536
94-0536
06/07/1994
App Writ of Error
TOM RODGERS
DR. RALPH COLEMAN and WILCREST MEDICAL CLINIC INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/08/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
08/11/1994Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/07/1994Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/08/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/02/1994Record returned to Court of AppealsMo/Re Overruled
09/01/1994Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruledMo/Re Overruled
08/11/1994Conditional motion for rehearingNo description available.CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date.
08/11/1994Motion for Rehearing
08/11/1994Motion for Rehearing forwardedRecord in Clerk's office
07/28/1994Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied
06/23/1994Case forwarded to Court
06/07/1994Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
09/02/1994Case StoredCase stored.Mo/Re Overruled
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
WILCREST MEDICAL CLINIC, INC.RespondentMr. Allan A. Cease
RODGERS, TOMPetitionerMr. John H. Holloway
COLEMAN, RALPHRespondentMr. Allan A. Cease
Court of Appeals Information:
01-93-00372-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
RULE 90, 02-24-94
1st Court of Appeals
Honorable ERIC ANDELL
Trial Court Information
234th District Court
Harris
Honorable Scott A. Brister
90-47582