judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-0628-94
PD-0628-94
06/07/1994
PDR Case Type
STAPLETON, LLOYD DIXIE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/15/1994FINAL DISPRefused
06/29/1994PDR DISPRefused
06/29/1994PDR DISPRefused
06/20/1994EXHIBIT FILED
06/13/1994MOTION DISPGranted
06/13/1994MOTION FILED
06/07/1994PDR FILED
06/07/1994PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/28/1994STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Stapleton, Lloyd DixieApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Cynthia Russell Henley
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn B. Holmes
Court of Appeals Information:
14-92-00324-CR
AFF 4-28-94
14th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
337th District Court
Harris
Honorable Wallace C. Moore
609980