judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SCHULZE VS. TEAM UP

Case Information: 33526
Short Caption:SCHULZE VS. TEAM UPCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 34033
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A391349Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/08/1999 / Galatz, NeilSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/29/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Beckley firm-check no. 68843.
12/29/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00536
01/08/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Neil Galatz. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/13/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00220
03/19/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: April 7, 1999. 99-02011
04/05/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: May 11, 1999. 99-02531
06/23/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 99-05503
07/09/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellant shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss this appeal or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. 99-06075
08/12/1999MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Agreement to Dismiss Appeal No. 33526 and Appeal No. 34033 (nos. 33526/34033). 99-07476
09/28/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in these matters and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . these appeals are dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 99-09291
09/28/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.