judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RICHARD V. GOSE and CELESTE M. GOSE v. CITY OF DOUGLAS, WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0133)
Case Number:S-09-0133Case Docketed On:07/06/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Converse CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:RICHARD V. GOSE and CELESTE M. GOSE v. CITY OF DOUGLAS, WYOMING
Full Title:RICHARD V. GOSE and CELESTE M. GOSE, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. CITY OF DOUGLAS, WYOMING, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRichard V. Gose Pro Se
AppellantCeleste M. Gose Pro Se
AppelleeCITY OF DOUGLAS, WYOMINGRick L. Koehmstedt

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Appellate Procedure
Opinion Number:2009 WY 131
Citation:218 P.3d 945

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/06/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/06/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/06/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/06/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/24/2009Brief - AppellantsBriefAppellantFinal
08/24/2009Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
10/09/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
10/13/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/15/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
10/30/2009Opinion - Published order - Order of Summary Affirmance. Brief of appellant and reply brief of appellant stricken and removed from file pursuant to order.OpinionPublished orderFinal
11/17/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/17/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/19/2009Event - Rejected Filing. Received "Motion for Redetermination and Answer to the Court's Order of Summary Affirmance and Motion to Reverse the Order." Returned to Mr. Gose without filing.EventRejected FilingFinal