judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-94-00318-CR
04-94-00318-CR
06/07/1994
Robbery
Nickerson, William C.
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/30/2017Letter filed
06/07/2016Internal memo
03/05/2003Information regarding cause received
06/19/1998Case Returned from Higher Court
10/30/1995Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
10/20/1995Mandate Issued
10/20/1995Mandate Issued
08/30/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/30/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/03/1995Response to Motion Filed
07/19/1995Response to Motion Filed
07/13/1995Information regarding cause received
05/31/1995Motion to Abate DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/23/1995Submitted
05/23/1995Submission
05/23/1995Submitted
05/12/1995Motion to Abate DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/10/1995Motion to Abate Filed
04/17/1995Motion to Withdraw Filed
04/13/1995Motion to Abate DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/05/1995Motion to Abate Filed
04/05/1995Submission
03/09/1995Brief Filed
03/09/1995Case ready to be set
03/09/1995Case ready to be set
03/02/1995Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/23/1995Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
02/13/1995Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/24/1995Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
12/30/1994Brief Filed
12/13/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion Granted in Part
12/13/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion Granted in Part
11/21/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
10/24/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
10/20/1994No Description Available.
10/12/1994No Description Available.
08/26/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
08/26/1994Motion for Leave DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/10/1994Motion for Leave Filed
08/10/1994No Description Available.
07/18/1994No Description Available.
06/18/1994No Description Available.
06/07/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/02/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
05/18/1994Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/07/2016Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
08/17/2018Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasMargaret M. Fent
Nickerson, #726344, William C.Criminal - AppellantWilliam Nickerson
Anthony B. Cantrell
James L. Rodriguez
William C. Nickerson #726344
Trial Court Information
227th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Mike M. Machado
94CR0105
Ninety-Nine (99) years