judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-94-00300-CV
04-94-00300-CV
06/07/1994
Automobile Personal Injury
Robertson, Lucille D.
Terrell, Gary C. & Zellers, Sharon
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/29/1994Mandate Issued
12/29/1994Mandate Issued
10/19/1994Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/19/1994Opinion issuedDismissed
10/19/1994Opinion issuedDismissed
09/13/1994Motion for Dismissal Filed
08/19/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/19/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/09/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
07/20/1994Motion DisposedDenied in part/Granted in part
07/20/1994Motion DisposedDenied in part/Granted in part
07/20/1994Motion DisposedDenied in part/Granted in part
07/12/1994Motion Filed
07/12/1994Motion Filed
06/13/1994No Description Available.
06/13/1994No Description Available.
06/08/1994Alternative Dispute Resolution Procedure Sent
06/07/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/26/1994No Description Available.
04/26/1994Appeal Bond Filed
04/26/1994Appeal Bond Filed
04/26/1994Petition for Writ Filed
12/03/1993Judgment Signed in Trial Court
12/03/1993Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/29/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Lucille D. RobertsonAppellantCathy J. Sheehan
Gary Terrell & Sharon ZellersAppelleeRon C. Bird
Trial Court Information
73rd Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Carolyn Spears Petersen
93-CI-15136
N/A