judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-94-00130-CV
02-94-00130-CV
06/07/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Receiver for Commonwealth Bank, Arlington,Federal Deposit Insurance Corp.,in its Corporate Capacity
Miller, John D., J.M. Miller, John D. Miller, III, and Brenda I. Miller
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/17/2008Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
03/17/1995Mandate Issued
01/31/1995Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/31/1995Opinion issuedDismissed
01/18/1995Motion for Dismissal Filed
01/04/1995Letter
10/18/1994Letter
08/19/1994Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/15/1994Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
06/28/1994Submission
06/23/1994No Description Available.
06/14/1994Extension to File Notice of Appeal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/07/1994Extension to File Notice of Appeal Filed
06/07/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/17/2008Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Miller, Brenda IAppelleeAlbert C. Ross
Federal Deposit Ins CorpAppellantRobert L. Warren
Miller, J.m.AppelleeAlbert C. Ross
Miller, III, John D.AppelleeAlbert C. Ross
Miller, John D.AppelleeAlbert C. Ross
Trial Court Information
348th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Michael Schattman
348-122077-89