judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 12-94-00161-CV
12-94-00161-CV
06/07/1994
Miscellaneous civil
F., E., The State of Texas for the Best Interest and Protection of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/18/2006Case has been destroyed/Records Retention Action
10/06/1994Case stored
10/03/1994
09/28/1994Mandate Issued
09/28/1994No Description Available.
09/12/1994
08/26/1994
08/11/1994Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
08/11/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/11/1994Submission
08/11/1994Submitted
07/20/1994
07/18/1994Case ready to be set
07/18/1994No Description Available.
07/07/1994Brief Filed
06/16/1994
06/07/1994No Description Available.
06/07/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/27/1994
05/26/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
05/17/1994Order Entered
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/18/2006Case DestroyedCase Destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasMr. Robert Mcnatt
F., E.AppellantMr. David Sorrell
Higginbotham, R.RespondentDr. R. Higginbotham
Trial Court Information
County Court
Cherokee
Honorable F. L. Garrison
16,168