judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DECHANT (AMY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33520
Short Caption:DECHANT (AMY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33792
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C145409Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:05/08/2000 at 2:30 PMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Office
Submission Date:05/08/2000How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/28/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/28/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00527
12/29/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
01/13/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. October 8,9,12,13,14,15,19,20,21,22,23,26,27 and 29; December 16, 1998 and December 18, 1998. Proceedings: To Court Reporter: Free Lance Reporters (mailed on: 01/12/99). 99-00216
01/13/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. July 7, 1998 Proceedings: To Court Reporter: Kit McDonald (mailed on: 01/12/99). 99-00217
01/13/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: 12/23/98 (mailed on: 01/12/99). 99-00219
01/14/1999MotionFiled Motion. Appellant's Motion for One Week Enlargement of Time to File Docketing Statement. 99-00261
01/19/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Document: docketing statement. New due date:1/20/99. 99-00327
01/20/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00391
02/12/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Entry Written Judgment or Order. Order due: 30 days. 99-01017
02/23/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Judgment of Conviction filed in district court on 1/22/99. 99-01225
02/26/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. 02/25/98; 03/27/98; and 07/07/98 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Kit MacDonald. 99-01326
04/16/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Motion for a Ninety Day Enlargement of Time to File Opening Brief. 99-02991
04/20/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. Brief and appendix due: July 19, 1999. 99-03097
05/11/1999Order/Procedural Order. Free Lance Reporters shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, file certified copies of the transcripts or inform this court that the transcripts were file I the district court prior to December 28, 1998. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in the imposition of sanctions. Trancripts due dated 1998: October 8, 9, 12, 13, 14, 15, 19, 20, 21, 22, 23, 26, 27, and 29, and December 16 and 18. 99-03770
07/19/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Motion for a Fourteen Day Enlargement of Time to File Opening Brief. 99-06420
07/23/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. Brief and appendix due: August 2, 1999. 99-06648
08/02/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 99-07035
10/01/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. The clerk of this court shall forthwith file the opening brief and appendix provisionally submitted on August 24, 1999. Free Lance Reporters shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, fully comply with the provisions of NRAP 9(b) and shall show cause why they should not be sanctioned for their failure to comply with or respond to this court's May 11, 1999, order. 99-09469
10/01/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 08/20/99. 99-07879
10/01/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 99-07880
11/03/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 99-10734
12/06/1999BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 12/03/99. 99-12210
03/27/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for May 8, 2000 at the hour of 2:30 p.m. for 1/2 hour in Las Vegas.(SNP99B-WM/MS/NB) 00-04893
04/06/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Although Free Lance Reporters has failed to respond to our orders in Docket No. 35520, we note that Free lance Reporters has filed the transcripts requested in the related case, Docket No. 33792. We also note that the briefs filed in Docket No. 33520 cite to the transcripts filed in Docket No. 33792. We waive the requirements of NRAP 9(b) in Docket No. 33520. The clerk of this court shall assure that the transcripts filed in Docket No. 33792 are retained for the court's review until the appeal in Docket No. 33520 is fully resolved. We admonish Free Lance Reporters for failing to respond to this court's orders and caution that such conduct in future appeals before this court may result in the imposition of sanctions. Nos. 35520, 33792-not consolidated. 00-05591
04/24/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 00-06413
05/08/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB
10/19/2000Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." fn4[Nothing in this opinion is intended to prohibit the State from attempting to introduce testimony from an individual with expertise in the patterns, if any, surrounding organized crime murders. Assuming such testimony was properly admitted, the State would also be free to argue that DeChant's version of the events does not follow the pattern of a mob contract murder.] Before Maupin, Shearing and Becker, JJ. Per Curiam. 116 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 100. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-18512
11/14/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-19002
11/14/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/04/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 17, 2000. 00-19002