judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HEATHER M. ZUPAN v. JOHN M. ZUPAN

Case Heading (S-09-0127)
Case Number:S-09-0127Case Docketed On:06/29/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Hot Springs CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:HEATHER M. ZUPAN v. JOHN M. ZUPAN
Full Title:HEATHER M. ZUPAN, Appellant (Defendant), v. JOHN M. ZUPAN, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantHeather M. ZupanWendy Press Sweeny
AppelleeJohn M. Zupan Jr.Bobbi Dean Overfield
Michael S. Messenger

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Child Custody/Visitation, Contempt, Jurisdiction
Opinion Number:2010 WY 59
Citation:230 P.3d 329

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/29/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/29/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/29/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/29/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/17/2009Brief - Appellant; and Statement of Costs.BriefAppellantFinal
08/18/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/02/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
10/05/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/13/2009Notice-Internal - Recusal memoNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
10/13/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
10/20/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
10/21/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/22/2009Event - Hardcopy received Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/26/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
11/02/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/02/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
11/12/2009Order - Assignment of judge Marvin L. TylerOrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
12/01/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
05/07/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Judge Tyler writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/25/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/25/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/25/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/25/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/27/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 5/26/2010.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal