judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

NANCY N. PETROVIC V. NATHAN A. FORRESTER

Case Information: 11-FM-0071
Short Caption:NANCY N. PETROVIC V. NATHAN A. FORRESTERClassification:Appeals - Family - Domestic Relations
Lead: 10-FM-1602 Consolidated:11-FM-0071
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DRB3458-02Filed Date:01/11/2011

Opening Event Date:01/11/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/03/2011
Argued/Submitted:04/12/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/18/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Appellant-Cross-AppelleeNathan A. Forrester N
Alan B. SoschinNY
Appellee-Cross-AppellantNancy N. Petrovic N
Judith L. WalterNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/11/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/28/2011ORDER, SUA SPONTE, CONSOLIDATING APPEALS 10-FM-1602 and 11-FS-71 are consolidated for all purposes herein. It is (MORE)
01/28/2011 ORDERED that the briefs shall be filed as follows: Opening brief (not to exceed 50 pages) of appellant/cross-appellee, and the appendix within 40 days from the date of this order; Responsive brief (not to exceed 50 pages) of appellee/cross-appellant, including opening brief of cross-appeal, within 30 days from the date of service of the opening brief of appellant/cross-appellee; Reply brief (not to exceed 20 pages) of appellant/cross-appellee, including response to the cross-appeal brief, within 21 days from the date of service of the response brief of appellee/cross-appellant; and Reply brief (not to exceed 20 pages) of appellee/cross-appellant, if any, within 21 days from the date of service of the reply brief of appellant/cross-appellee. (ETW)
02/03/2011RECORD INDEX (both)
02/03/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (exhibits)
03/09/2011APLT-X-APLE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo 30 days
03/21/2011ORDER GRANT APLT-X-APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF and appendix shall be filed on or before April 11, 2011. (JAC)
04/11/2011APLT-X-APLE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 4 days
04/18/2011APLT-X-APLE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF and joint appendix
04/18/2011RECEIVED - aplts cross aple brief & appendix
05/10/2011ORDER GRANT APLT-X-APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF and the lodged brief and joint appendix are filed. It is F/O that appellee/cross-appellant's brief shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (JAC)
05/10/2011APPELLANT/CROSS-APPELLEE'S BRIEF
05/10/2011APPENDIX (joint)
06/09/2011APLE-X-APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until June 20, 2011 (no oppo) (Petrovic)
06/20/2011RECEIVED - Appellee's/Cross-Appellant Brief
06/28/2011ORDER GRANT APLE-X-APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF and the lodged brief is filed. It is F/O that appellant/cross-appellee's reply brief shall be filed within 21 days from the date of this order. (JAC)
06/28/2011APPELLEE/CROSS-APPELLANT'S BRIEF
07/19/2011FiledMotion cross aple motion for extension of time in which to file reply brief (Appellant) to August 21, 2011Granted
07/29/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion cross aple motion for extension of time in which to file reply brief (Appellant) to August 15, 2011
08/26/2011FiledOrder - directing motion & brief of appellant/cross-appellee
09/06/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File reply brief (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)Granted
10/03/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to File reply brief (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)
10/03/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)
10/03/2011FiledBriefing Completed
10/24/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)
11/18/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
12/05/2011FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
12/09/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)
03/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
04/12/2012FiledArgued before Glickman, Easterly, Epstein
04/26/2012FiledAffirmed In Part/Remanded In Part (MOJ) (Glickman and Easterly, Associate Judges, and Epstein, Associate Judge, Superior Court of the District of Columbia.*)
05/18/2012FiledMandate