judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-6877
B-6877
06/29/1977
Application for Writ of Error
PATRICIA L. BOWLING, ET VIR
CITY OF PORT ARTHUR, TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/28/1977Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
11/22/1977Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
07/14/1977Response to PetitionRespondent
06/29/1977Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/23/1978Order from Lower Court filed
11/28/1977Supplemental Brief filed
11/22/1977Supplemental Brief filed
07/14/1977Response to Petition
06/29/1977Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/29/1977Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
CITY OF PORT ARTHUR, TEXASRespondent
Patricia L. Bowling, et virPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information