judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SCOTT KERBS, an individual and as a partner in the Kerbs Four Bar Ranch Partnership, KIP KERBS, an individual and as a partner in the Kerbs Four Bar Ranch Partnership, CARL KERBS and NADENE KERBS, individually, as husband and wife, and as partners in the Kerbs Four Bar Ranch Partnership, and KERBS FOUR BAR RANCH, a Wyoming Partnership v. EUGENE W. WALCK, JR.

Case Heading (S-09-0121)
Case Number:S-09-0121Case Docketed On:06/24/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Water (Title 41)
Short Title:SCOTT KERBS, an individual and as a partner in the Kerbs Four Bar Ranch Partnership, KIP KERBS, an individual and as a partner in the Kerbs Four Bar Ranch Partnership, CARL KERBS and NADENE KERBS, individually, as husband and wife, and as partners in the Kerbs Four Bar Ranch Partnership, and KERBS FOUR BAR RANCH, a Wyoming Partnership v. EUGENE W. WALCK, JR.
Full Title:SCOTT KERBS, an individual and as a partner in the Kerbs Four Bar Ranch Partnership, KIP KERBS, an individual and as a partner in the Kerbs Four Bar Ranch Partnership, CARL KERBS and NADENE KERBS, individually, as husband and wife, and as partners in the Kerbs Four Bar Ranch Partnership, and KERBS FOUR BAR RANCH, a Wyoming Partnership, Appellants (Defendants), v. EUGENE W. WALCK, JR., Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantScott A. KerbsDaniel Barry Frank
AppellantKip D. KerbsDaniel Barry Frank
AppellantCarl D. KerbsDaniel Barry Frank
AppellantNadene KerbsDaniel Barry Frank
AppellantKerbs Four Bar Ranch, a Wyoming PartnershipDaniel Barry Frank
AppelleeEugene W. Walck Jr.William Michael MacPherson
Brandon Wayne Snyder

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Trial - Damages, Water Law
Opinion Number:2010 WY 53
Citation:229 P.3d 974

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/24/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/24/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/24/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/24/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/11/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/12/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' opening brief.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/24/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
09/25/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellee Eugene W. Walck, Jr.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/28/2009Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
10/12/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
10/13/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/14/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/15/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, three volumes, (Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Exhibits)RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/26/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/28/2009Motion - Other - Motion to vacate oral argument.MotionOtherFinal
11/02/2009Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
11/02/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for ContinuanceEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/02/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Brandon Snyder for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/12/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/30/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Brandon W. Snyder for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/16/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Daniel B. Frank for appellants; William M. MacPherson and Brandon Wayne Snyder, argument by Mr. Snyder for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
12/16/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/27/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/07/2010Motion - Other - Fees and CostsMotionOtherFinal
05/10/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of Submission for Costs Pursuant to Wyo. R. App. P. 10-05EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/25/2010Order - Other - Order awarding costs on affirmanceOrderOtherFinal
05/25/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/25/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/25/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/25/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/27/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 5/26/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal