judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARSAW VS. HANILY

Case Information: 38342
Short Caption:MARSAW VS. HANILYCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D196258Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/23/2001 / Levitt, LansfordSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/10/2003How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/17/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Mark A. Jenkin Ltd.--check no. 5394.
08/17/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14038
08/23/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/06/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-15041
09/11/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Lansford W. Levitt.
02/26/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 02-03565
03/05/2002Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. This court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a). Because this is a child custody matter, appellant shall have 90 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Respondent shall have 20 days after service of the opening brief to file and serve the answering brief. Appellant shall have 10 days after service of the answering brie to file and serve the reply brief. NRAP 31(a)(2). 02-04029
03/18/2002Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: July 30, 2001. To Court Reporter: Shelly Ajoub. 02-04858
03/25/2002TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: July 30, 2001. Court Reporter: Alice F. Eastgate. 02-05240
06/05/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (child custody) 02-09814
06/13/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed June 5, 2002. Appellant shall file and serve the opening brief and appendix by July 3, 2002. We remind counsel for appellant that appeals involving child custody are subject to the expedited briefing schedule set forth in NRAP 31(a)(2). 02-10230
07/08/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 07/03/02. 02-11573
07/08/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 02-11574
07/23/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Child custody). 02-12606
07/30/2002Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed July 23, 2002. Respondent shall have until August 23, 2002, to file and serve the answering brief. Counsel is reminded that extensions of time will be granted only in extraordinary cases that present unforeseeable circumstances justifying an extension of time. NRAP 31(a)(2). 02-13096
08/19/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 08/15/02. 02-14131
08/19/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 02-14132
08/28/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 02-14860
09/04/2002Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed August 28, 2002. Appellant shall have until September 21, 2002, to file and serve the reply brief. 02-15225
09/16/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 09/12/02. 02-16074
01/10/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 03-00525
01/10/2003Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP03-MS/ML/NB
03/17/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED and REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." SNP03-MS/ML/NB 03-04386
04/11/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-04615
04/11/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/28/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 14, 2003. 03-04615