judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-9631
A-9631
05/30/1963
MISC PETITION
EVERETT R. BELL
FIDENCIO M. GUERRA, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/12/1963Supplement to Petition filedRelator
06/06/1963Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/22/1963Motion to dismissFiling granted
06/12/1963Affidavit filed
06/12/1963Supplement to Petition filed
06/11/1963Motion to Amend Filed
06/06/1963Brief in Support of Petition
06/06/1963Amendment to Motion filed Filing granted
05/30/1963Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusOverruled
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Fidencio M. Guerra, et al.Respondent
Everett R. BellRelator
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information