judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-9645
A-9645
06/07/1963
Application for Writ of Error
RUSSELL S. HARDIN, ET AL.
CENTRAL AMERICAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/23/1964Brief in Support of PetitionAmicus Curiae
01/23/1964Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/12/1963Response to Brief filedRespondent
10/25/1963Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
10/13/1963Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
10/07/1963Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
09/27/1963Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
06/20/1963Response to PetitionRespondent
06/17/1963Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
06/17/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/07/1964Response to Motion filed
01/23/1964Brief in Support of Petition
01/23/1964Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/08/1964Opinion issued
11/12/1963Response to Brief filed
10/25/1963Amicus Curiae Brief received
10/13/1963Amicus Curiae Brief received
10/07/1963Amicus Curiae Brief received
09/27/1963Amicus Curiae Brief received
07/17/1963Document received (See Remarks)
07/17/1963Document received (See Remarks)
07/17/1963Document received (See Remarks)
07/17/1963Document received (See Remarks)
06/20/1963Response to Petition
06/17/1963Amicus Curiae Brief received
06/17/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/07/1963Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Central American Life Insurance CompanyRespondent
Southland Life Insurance Company of Dallas, TexasAmicus Curiae
Russell S. Hardin, et al.Petitioner
City of DallasAmicus Curiae
J. S. Winters and Mary Joe CarrollAmicus Curiae
Great Southern Life Insurance CompanyAmicus Curiae
Texas Municipal LeagueAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information