judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

VIRGINIA L. WALTERS v. LONNIE WALTERS

Case Heading (S-09-0152)
Case Number:S-09-0152Case Docketed On:08/07/2009
Linked To: S-10-0059
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:VIRGINIA L. WALTERS v. LONNIE WALTERS
Full Title:VIRGINIA L. WALTERS, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. LONNIE WALTERS, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantVirginia L. WaltersKristin Shaun Wilkerson
AppelleeLonnie WaltersMary T. Parsons

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contempt, Marriage and Divorce - Property Division
Opinion Number:2011 WY 41
Citation:249 P.3d 214

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/07/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/07/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/07/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/07/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/27/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/28/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of TimeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/31/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/30/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/04/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on Appeal (Received 2 days late)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/16/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/16/2009Motion - Supplement the recordMotionSupplement the recordFinal
12/16/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Motion to Supplement RecordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/18/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
12/22/2009Notice-Incoming - Other Motion to Supplement Record filed in District Court.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
01/04/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
01/04/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/05/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
01/05/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellant, Virginia WaltersEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/08/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/08/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/12/2010Order - Denying Motion to Supplement RecordOrderDenyFinal
01/26/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
04/06/2010Order - Consolidating cases (No extensions of time allowed)OrderConsolidating casesFinal
03/09/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/22/2011Event - Phone Call from counsel for Appellee re mandate and costs, suggested that motion be filedEventPhone CallFinal
03/25/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/25/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/25/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/25/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/29/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 3/28/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
01/18/2012Record - Record returned to district court, transcript discovered in Justice's fileRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal