judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ADRIAN T. LEE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0109
Short Caption:ADRIAN T. LEE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-12693-09Filed Date:02/02/2011

Opening Event Date:02/02/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/25/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/20/2012
Argued/Submitted:01/30/2013
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/18/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAdrian T. Lee Y
James W. KleinNY
Mikel Meredith WeidmanYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Amanda J. Winchester YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/02/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/11/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
03/14/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
04/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(7 pgs. -- Maddox) 9/20/10 proc.)
04/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (198 pgs. -- Maddox) (9/23-24/10 proc.)
04/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(250 pgs. -- Gilliam) (9/27-28/10 proc.)
04/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4(507 pgs. -- Richer) (9/28-30/10 proc.)
04/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5(pgs. 508-894 -- Richer) (10/4-6/10 proc.)
04/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6(17 pgs. -- Etekochay) (1/14/11 proc.)
04/25/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/03/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
05/09/2011RECORD INDEX
05/09/2011RECORD COPIES
05/09/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (SEALED ORDERS)
06/13/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 90 days (no oppo).
06/15/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before September 12, 2011. (JAC)
09/12/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File brief. Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
09/23/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time to 12/12/11.
12/02/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
12/19/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix to 3/12/12.
03/05/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
03/09/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
04/11/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
04/11/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
05/08/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
05/15/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 6/20/12
06/19/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
07/03/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to7/20/12
07/20/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
07/20/2012FiledBriefing Completed
08/15/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
08/15/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
08/24/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
12/03/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
01/14/2013FiledMotion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Appellant)
01/15/2013FiledMotion To Supplement The Record (Appellant)
01/18/2013FiledOrder Granting Motion to Late File Reply Brief and Motion to Supplement the Record
01/18/2013FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
01/30/2013FiledArgued before Judges Glickman, Oberly, Farrell, Mikel Meredith Weidman, Esq. for appellant Amanda J. Winchester, Esq. for appellee
02/01/2013FiledSupplemental Record specify - #8 (letter to USAO from to Attorney Ballantine)
02/28/2013FiledReversed And Remanded (OPINION) (Glickman and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Farrell, Senior Judge.)
03/11/2013FiledMotion to issue the mandate forthwith (Appellant)Granted
03/18/2013FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to issue the mandate.
03/18/2013FiledMandate