judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE, DMV VS. OVERBO

Case Information: 33564
Short Caption:STATE, DMV VS. OVERBOCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A381528Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/14/1999 / Shirinian, AraSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/06/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/06/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-00057
01/06/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. Sat in district court proceedings.
01/14/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/20/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00390
04/19/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 99-03038
04/23/1999MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 99-03196
07/23/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We defer ruling on the stipulation to remand filed April 23, 1999. Appellant shall, within 60 days of the date of this order, file in this court a copy of an order from the district court certifying that it is inclined to grant the relief requested by the parties. Alternatively, appellant shall have 60 days to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed. 99-06654
07/26/1999MotionFiled Motion. Joint Motion to Remand Case to District Court. NRAP 27. 99-06723
08/12/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. The parties have jointly moved this court to remand this matter to the district court. We grant the motion. " . . . we remand this matter to the district court pursuant to its certification, and we dismiss this appeal." NNP99B-RR/CY/DA 99-07481
08/12/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.