judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

L. B. CRAMER, ET AL. v. F. T. GRAHAM, ET AL.

Case: A-4578
A-4578
03/22/1954
Application for Writ of Error
L. B. CRAMER, ET AL.
F. T. GRAHAM, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/14/1954Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
07/20/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/31/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
03/22/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/14/1954Brief in Support of Petition
07/26/1954Response to Motion filed
07/20/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/31/1954Response to Petition
03/22/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
03/22/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
F. T. Graham, et al.Respondent
L. B. Cramer, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information