judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BOLES VS. WETHERALL

Case Information: 33563
Short Caption:BOLES VS. WETHERALLCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - DV9600895Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/14/1999 / Richards, PaulSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/06/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from James Andre Boles--check no. 2097.
01/06/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-00055
01/14/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Paul A. Richards. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/20/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00401
01/27/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Mailed on: 1/26/99. 99-00575
01/27/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. This appeal shall be dismissed. Each party is to pay their own costs. Mailed on: 1/26/99. 99-00577
02/09/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is hereby dismissed, the parties to bear their own costs." NRAP 42(b). SNP 99-00886