judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOHNEL T. MCQUEEN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CO-0108
Short Caption:JOHNEL T. MCQUEEN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL2363-04Filed Date:02/01/2011

Opening Event Date:02/01/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:02/16/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/24/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohnel T. Mcqueen Y
George E. RickmanYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
05/23/1971 On consideration of appellant's motions for extensions of time within which to file the brief, to which no oppostions have been filed, and the lodged brief and limited appendix, it is ORDERED that appellant's motions are granted and the lodged brief and limited appendix are filed. Iti s FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee_ shall be filed with this court within 30 days from the date of this order. (dfe)
02/01/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/02/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) George Rickman, Esquire
02/10/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on February 1, 2011, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that George Rickman, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal nunc pro tunc to February 2, 2011. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and r ecord copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
02/16/2011RECORD INDEX
02/16/2011RECORD COPIES
02/16/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/23/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
04/14/2011 On consideration of this court's order of February 23, 2011, directing counsel for appellant to file the brief, and the limited appendix as required by D.C.App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
05/04/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 7 days (no oppo)
05/11/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until May 13, 2011 (unopposed)
05/13/2011RECEIVED- aplt's brief & appendix
05/26/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, and the lodged brief and limited appendix, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged brief and limited appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee_ shall be filed with this court within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: JAC)
05/26/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
05/26/2011APPENDIX
06/13/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL for Want of Subject Matter Jurisdiction.
06/14/2011TMC - appellee's motion to dismiss
08/01/2011FiledOrder Granting MOTION TO DISMISS
08/01/2011FiledDismissed
08/24/2011FiledMandate