judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

FRED GRIEGER v. MATILDA VEGA

Case: A-4577
A-4577
03/22/1954
Application for Writ of Error
FRED GRIEGER
MATILDA VEGA
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/29/1954Motion for RehearingRespondent
06/01/1954Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
05/22/1954Brief on the MeritsRespondent
03/22/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/29/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/14/1954Dissenting opinion issued.
07/14/1954Opinion issued
06/01/1954Brief on the Merits
05/22/1954Brief on the Merits
04/14/1954Document received (See Remarks)
03/22/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/22/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Fred GriegerPetitioner
Matilda VegaRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information