judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DEMINANIDIS VS. STATE

Case Information: 33553
Short Caption:DEMINANIDIS VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 40339
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C138909Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/05/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. Sat in district court proceedings.
01/05/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/05/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-00039
01/12/1999Order/CounselFiled Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney James L. Buchanan shall file the transcript request form within10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. 99-00172
02/11/1999MotionFiled Motion. (mailed on 02/02/99). 99-00961
03/01/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On February 2, 1999, counsel for appellant filed a motion to withdraw from representation of appellant. Counsel has not filed a fast track statement. The motion is therefore denied. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 20 days of this order. 99-01352
03/22/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-02044
03/25/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Receipt of Copy. 99-02166
03/29/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Motion for an Enlargement of Time in which File the Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-02281
04/06/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. Appendix to the fast track statement. Due: 15 days from the date of this order. 99-02567
04/13/1999MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion to Dismiss Appeal for Failure to Comply with NRS 177.025. 99-02786
04/13/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. 11/16/98; 11/19/98; and 12/08/98 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. 99-02804
04/14/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-02884
04/28/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk is directed to strike the fast track statement filed on March 22, 1999. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to serve and file an amended fast track statement and a joint appendix or an appellant's appendix. Respondent shall have 20 days from filing of the amended fast track statement and appendix to serve and file the fast track response. fn1[Respondent's motion to dismiss this appeal is denied]. 99-03366
05/11/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. Letter to all counsel--Upon further review it has been determined that Justice Leavitt should not be disqualified from participation in this matter. 99-03823
06/01/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Amended Fast Track Statement. 99-04531
06/04/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. The (amended) fast track statement and appendix shall be filed and served within 20 days of this order. 99-04690
06/28/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-05681
07/01/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Appellant's Second Supplemental Appendix. 99-05789
07/02/1999MotionFiled Motion to Strike. Motion to Strike Defendant's Amended Fast Track Statement and Dismiss Appeal. 99-05814
07/08/1999MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellant's Response to Respondent's Motion to Strike Defendant's Amended Fast Track Statement and Dismiss Appeal. 99-06069
08/13/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall strike the fast track statement filed on June 28, 1999. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve a fast track statement and appendix within 20 days of this order, or show cause why counsel should not be sanctioned for failure to comply with NRAP 3C. fn1[Counsel for appellant is cautioned that continued failure to comply with the requirements of NRAP 3C and the order of this court will result in the imposition of sanctions]. 99-07499
10/15/1999Order/CounselFiled Order/Sanctions. Counsel has failed to respond to this court's order of August 16, 1999. Counsel for appellant shall personally pay the sum of $100.00 to the Supreme Court Law Library and provide this court with proof of said payment within 20 days of the date of this order and shall file and serve the fast track statement within 10 days of this order or show cause why counsel should not be sanctioned further.
04/12/2000Order/CounselFiled Order/Sanctions. We conclude that Buchanan's failure to comply with this court's orders and NRAP 3C warrants additional sanctions in the sum of $250.00. Buchanan shall personally pay the sum of $250.00 to the Supreme Court Law Library, and shall provide proof of such payment to the clerk of this court within 15 days from the date of this order. Finally, Buchanan shall file and serve the amened fast track statement and appendix in this appeal within 10 days of the date of this order, or show cause why he should not be sanctioned further. Fn1[Additionally, we note that the $100.00 Buchanan was previously sanctioned is still unpaid and due]. 00-05875
05/05/2000Other Returned Unfiled Document. Original and two copies of the Amended Fast Track Statement with letter.
05/11/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Motion for an Enlargement of Time in which to File the Appendix to Fast Track Statement and the Amended Fast Track Statement. 00-07839
05/11/2000Fast Track BriefReceived Fast Track Statement. 00-07841
05/19/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file, forthwith, the amended fast track statement and appendix provisionally submitted on May 11, 2000. 00-08376
05/19/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-07841
05/19/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 00-07843
05/26/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-08962
05/26/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 00-08963
10/02/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having considered appellant's arguments and concluded that they are without merit, " . . . we order the district court's judgment affirmed." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we concude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP00A-CY/WM/NB 00-17285
10/31/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-17407
10/31/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/03/2000Order/CounselFiled Order/Sanctions. James Buchanan shall personally pay the previously imposed sanctions in the sum of $250.00 to the Supreme Court Law Library and provide the clerk of this court with an affidavit or certificate verifying that payment has been made to the Supreme Court Law Library within 10 days of the date of this order, or show cause why Buchanan should not be sanctioned further. 00-19350
11/15/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Payment of Sanction. Affidavit of James L. Buchanan II. (Payment of $250.00) 00-20074
12/04/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 13, 2000. 00-17407