judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MORA-MARIN (EDUARDO) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33554
Short Caption:MORA-MARIN (EDUARDO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 37124 , 46772 , 48669
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR980730Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/12/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/05/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/05/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-00040
01/12/1999Order/CounselFiled Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney Paul Quade shall file the transcript request form within10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. 99-00173
02/18/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. 11/09/98 and 11/12/98 Proceedings: To Court Reporter: Randi Walker. 99-01092
02/18/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. 11/10/98 and 11/13/98 Proceedings: To Court Reporter: Becky Van Auken. 99-01093
02/19/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. 12/17/98 Proceedings: To Court Reporter: Debbie Vieira. 99-01141
02/24/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 11/13/98. Court Reporter: Becky Van Auken. 99-01269
02/26/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-01336
03/01/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. 11/09/98 and 11/12/98 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Randi Lee Walker. 99-01398
03/10/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-01678
03/10/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 11/10/98. Court Reporter: Carol Hummel. 99-01679
04/02/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Fast Track. The clerk of this court is directed to strike the fast track statement filed on February 26, 1999 and the fast track response filed on March 10, 1999. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to serve and file an amended fast track statement which conforms to the rules of appellate procedure. Counsel for appellant is cautioned that any future failure to comply with these rules may subject him to sanctions. 99-02463
04/12/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. 11/12/98 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Randi Lee Walker. 99-02734
05/04/1999MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion to Exceed the Ten-Page Limitation on the Fast Track Statement. 99-03565
05/07/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On May 4, 1999, appellant filed a moiton for leave to file a fast track statement in excess of 10 pages. The clerk shall file, forthwith, the fast track statement received on May 4, 1999. 99-03681
05/07/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-03567
05/20/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-04180
05/26/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Schedule. We have determined that full briefing will assist the court in the disposition of this appeal. Opening brief and appendix due: 40 days after the date of this order. The answering brief and reply brief shall be filed in compliance with NRAP 31. fn2[We hereby suspend the requiremet in NRAP 9 for counsel to file a certified transcript in this appeal]. 99-04367
07/06/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: 8/6/99. 99-05941
08/09/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 8/6/99. 99-07332
09/02/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 9/1/99. 99-08262
09/02/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 99-08263
10/01/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: November 1, 1999. 99-09467
10/13/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. 99-09940
11/04/1999BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 11/02/99. 99-10802
04/12/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this matter shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the papers filed herein. 00-05891
04/12/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
04/14/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to Carl Christen in response to her letter received 4/10/00.
07/07/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-11593
07/27/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. for appellant. 00-13076
08/01/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-13308
08/01/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/08/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 4, 2000. 00-13308
10/03/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On July 27, 2000, appellant's counsel, Paul E. Quade, filed a "Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel" in this appeal. This court having entered an order dismissing this appeal on July 7, 2000, and having issued the remittitur on August 1, 2000, attorney Quade is deemed to have withdrawn, and no further action will be taken with regard to attorney Quade's notice. 00-17550