judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CAP, a minor child, by and through GLORIA VALEE TOLEDO, her grandmother and next friend, and GLORIA VALEE TOLEDO, individually; and SARAHY BRINGAS, JACKELYN PAGUAGA, and NOELIA SARAHY PAGUAGA, by and through GLORIA VALEE TOLEDO, their next friend and Guardian, Administrator, Conservator of the Estates, v. CENTRAL REFRIGERATED SERVICE, INC., a Utah corporation; JOHN C. NASH, JR., an individual; C.R. ENGLAND, a Utah Corporation; TADEUSZ ZNOJEWSKI, an individual; FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM, INC., a Delaware corporation; MARTEN TRANSPORT, LTD., a Delaware corporation

Case Heading (S-09-0141)
Case Number:S-09-0141Case Docketed On:07/24/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:CAP, a minor child, by and through GLORIA VALEE TOLEDO, her grandmother and next friend, and GLORIA VALEE TOLEDO, individually; and SARAHY BRINGAS, JACKELYN PAGUAGA, and NOELIA SARAHY PAGUAGA, by and through GLORIA VALEE TOLEDO, their next friend and Guardian, Administrator, Conservator of the Estates, v. CENTRAL REFRIGERATED SERVICE, INC., a Utah corporation; JOHN C. NASH, JR., an individual; C.R. ENGLAND, a Utah Corporation; TADEUSZ ZNOJEWSKI, an individual; FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM, INC., a Delaware corporation; MARTEN TRANSPORT, LTD., a Delaware corporation
Full Title:CAP, a minor child, by and through GLORIA VALEE TOLEDO, her grandmother and next friend, and GLORIA VALEE TOLEDO, individually; and SARAHY BRINGAS, JACKELYN PAGUAGA, and NOELIA SARAHY PAGUAGA, by and through GLORIA VALEE TOLEDO, their next friend and Guardian, Administrator, Conservator of the Estates, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. CENTRAL REFRIGERATED SERVICE, INC., a Utah corporation; JOHN C. NASH, JR., an individual; C.R. ENGLAND, a Utah Corporation; TADEUSZ ZNOJEWSKI, an individual; FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM, INC., a Delaware corporation; MARTEN TRANSPORT, LTD., a Delaware corporation, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCynthya Azucena PaguagaTony S. Lopez
AppellantJackelyn PaguagaTony S. Lopez
AppellantNoelia Sarahy PaguagaTony S. Lopez
AppellantGloria Valee ToledoTony S. Lopez
AppellantSarahy BringasTony S. Lopez
AppelleeCentral Refrigerated Service, Inc.Rebecca A. Lewis
Andrew MacGillivray Morse
AppelleeJohn C. Nash Jr.Paul Kapp
Kay Lynn Bestol
AppelleeC. R. EnglandPaul Kapp
Kay Lynn Bestol
AppelleeTadeusz ZnojewskiRichard Grant Schneebeck
Lindsay Ann Woznick
AppelleeFedex Ground Package System, Inc.Richard Grant Schneebeck
Lindsay Ann Woznick
AppelleeMarten Transport, Ltd.G.G. Greg Greenlee
Heather Anne Zadina
Other Particpants
Interested ObserverSBS TruckingHampton K. O'Neill

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Estates, Other
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/24/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/24/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/24/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/24/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/10/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/11/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Brief (Returned envelopes left by counsel)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/02/2009Motion - Dismiss - stipulated by Appellees Central Refrigerated Services, Inc., John C. Nash, Jr., C.R. England, Inc., Tadeusz Znojewski, and FedEx Ground Package Systems, Inc.MotionDismiss - stipulatedFinal
10/05/2009Event - Phone Call to counsel filing motion for stay/extension incorporated in motion to dismiss. Requested motion for extension of time be submitted separately.EventPhone CallFinal
10/05/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellees' Rule 7.10 Motion to Toll or Extend Time for ResponseEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/05/2009Motion - Extension of time - otherMotionExtension of time - otherFinal
10/05/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellees' Rule 1.03 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Comply with W.R.A.P and Present Cogent Argument or to Summarily Affirm the Decision of the District Court and Rule 7.10 Motion to Toll or Extend Time for Response and Memorandum in Support of MotionEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/06/2009Order - Grant - extension of time (parties to motion only)OrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/06/2009Event - Phone Call from counsel for Appellees Podgorni and West Wind Express, they are not a party to this appealEventPhone CallFinal
10/06/2009Event - Phone Call from counsel for Appellee Marten Transport, Ltd. Mr. Greenlee and Ms. Zadina. Their client is a party to the appeal. They are also aware to the pleadings filed via electronic serviceEventPhone CallFinal
10/06/2009Notice-Internal - Other Appellees Marian Podgorni and West Wind Express removed from caption.Notice-InternalOtherFinal
10/20/2009Response/Objection - MotionResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
10/21/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Response to Appellees" Rule 1.03 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Comply with W.R.A.P. and Present Cogent Argument or to Summarily Affirm the Decision of the District Court and Rule 7.10 Motion to Toll or Entend Time for ResponseEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/22/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
10/22/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellee/Defendant/Judgment Creditor Marten Transport, Ltd.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/23/2009Notice-Incoming - Designation of record by counsel for Appellee MartenNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
10/27/2009Order - Denying Motion to Dismiss AppealOrderDenyFinal
11/19/2009Brief - Appellees C.R. England, Central Refrigerated Service, Inc., Fedex Ground Package System, Inc., John C. Nash, Jr., and Tadeusz ZnojewskiBriefAppelleeFinal
11/20/2009Event - Phone Call re filed brief, changes will have to be made by motionEventPhone CallFinal
11/23/2009Notice-Incoming - Designation of record by counsel for Appellees Central Refrigerated Service, Inc., John C. Nash, Jr., C.R. England, Tadeusz Zonjewski and Fedex Ground Package System, Inc.Notice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
11/23/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/30/2009Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
11/30/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to dismiss appeal without prejudice and to remand to District Court; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/04/2009Event - Phone Call from counsel for Appellants re response and reply brief.EventPhone CallFinal
12/04/2009Response/Objection - MotionResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
12/07/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Response to Appellees' Motion to Dismiss Appeal Without Prejudice and to Remand to District CourtEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/14/2009Order - Dismissing Appeal and Order of Remand to District CourtOrderDismissingFinal
12/15/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal