judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MAURICE GOODMAN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0100
Short Caption:MAURICE GOODMAN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD7989-10Filed Date:01/28/2011

Opening Event Date:01/28/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/03/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/20/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMaurice Goodman NPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/28/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (54pgs/Tape) 12/14/10 proc.
02/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (47pgs/Tape) 12/15/10 proc.
02/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (155pgs/Tape) 12/16/10 proc. w/CD
02/03/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/07/2011RECORD INDEX
02/07/2011RECORD COPIES
02/10/2011ORDERED: That appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order tender the $100 docketing fee. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (By: JAC)
02/23/2011LETTER - from Nikolaos Kourtesis stating that is not representig aplt
03/10/2011ORDERED: That the appearance of Nick Kourtesis, Esquire, is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record for appellant. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall advise this court, within 30 days from the date of this order, as to the identity of new counsel, or if he intends to proceed on appeal pro se. Failure to comply with this order shall result in appellant being deemed as proceeding on appeal pr ose. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (By: ETW)
04/28/2011ORDER: ORDERED, ss, that appellant shall proceed on appeal pro se. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall w/in 15 days from the date of this order submit the brief and the appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time w/in which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shallsubject this appeal to dismissal w/out further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW)
05/26/2011ORDER: This appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: ETW)
05/26/2011DISMISSED
06/20/2011MANDATE ISSUED