Case: 94-0289
94-0289
03/28/1994
App Writ of Error
TEODORO GARZA ROSALINDA GARZA MARY ANN GARZA and BELINDA GARZA
ARTURO G. GARZA MARIA DORA SALINAS FELICITAS TORRES and MARIA IGNACIA RODRIGUEZ
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/09/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/08/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/07/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
07/13/1994 | Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed | Respondent | | |
06/23/1994 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
04/12/1994 | Reply to Response | Respondent | | |
03/28/1994 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/09/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/08/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/07/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
08/03/1994 | list missing briefs when case is separated(remarks | COA Br: 2nd inventoried Ape Rply Br - sent back Ape Br filed 08-30-93 | | |
08/03/1994 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | COA Br: Second Inventoried Ape Rply Br sent back Ape Rply Br filed 08-03-93 | | |
07/28/1994 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Overruled | | |
07/13/1994 | Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed | | | |
07/05/1994 | Notice requesting filing fee | reply to mo/re - $5.00 (return check for $10) to Alfonso Ibanez | | |
06/23/1994 | Conditional motion for rehearing | No description available. | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date. | |
06/23/1994 | Motion for Rehearing | | | |
06/23/1994 | Motion for Rehearing forwarded | record remains in clerk's office | | |
06/08/1994 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Denied | | |
04/14/1994 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
04/12/1994 | Reply to Response | | | |
03/28/1994 | appendix to application | Copies of Opinion Appendix for App | | |
03/28/1994 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
08/03/1994 | Case Stored | Case stored. | Mo/Re Overruled |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
GARZA, MARY ANN | Petitioner | Mr. Humberto Silva |
GARZA, ARTURO G. | Respondent | Mr. Alfonso Ibanez |
GARCIA, BRIAN ANTHONY (MINOR) | Intervenor | Mr. Rodrigo Martinez |
GARZA, ROSALINDA | Petitioner | Mr. Robert B. Luther |
GARCIA, AMANDA ANN | Intervenor | Mr. Rodrigo Martinez |
Garza, BELINDA | Petitioner | Mr. Humberto Silva |
TORRES, FELICITAS | Respondent | Mr. Alfonso Ibanez |
SALINAS, MARIA DORA | Respondent | Mr. Alfonso Ibanez |
GARZA, TEODORO | Petitioner | Mr. Robert B. Luther |
RODRIGUEZ, MARIA IGNACIA | Respondent | Mr. Alfonso Ibanez |
Court of Appeals Information:
13-92-00074-CV
Reversed & Rendered
___ SW2d ___, 01-13-94
13th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 3
Hidalgo
Honorable Ricardo Garcia
17,129-C